MA H2862 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Malia of Boston, a petition of Elizabeth A. Malia and others that the Commissioner of the Department of Early Education and Care be directed to ensure reasonable assignment levels for day care centers and family day care homes. Education.
Title
Creating assignment levels in the Department of Early Education and Care
Sponsors
Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] |
Sen. Barbara L'Italien [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-01-29 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H2874 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - New draft substituted, see H4665
H3765 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4641
H4310 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4594
H4594 (Similar To) 2018-07-25 - New draft substituted, see H4815
H4665 (Similar To) 2018-06-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4815 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 202 of the Acts of 2018
H3765 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4641
H4310 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4594
H4594 (Similar To) 2018-07-25 - New draft substituted, see H4815
H4665 (Similar To) 2018-06-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4815 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 202 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2862 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2862.pdf |