MA H2863 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4716
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the disclosure of information concerning public school post-regular season athletic events. Education.
Title
Relative to the disclosure of information of public school athletic resources and interscholastic athletic authorized representatives
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4716 |
2017-05-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H239 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H256 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
S1997 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
H2059 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
H1920 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4376
H2845 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H2024 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4641
S2367 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4716 (Replaced by) 2018-07-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H256 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
S1997 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
H2059 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
H1920 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4376
H2845 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H2024 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4641
S2367 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4716 (Replaced by) 2018-07-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2863 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2863.pdf |