MA H2875 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4632
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4632
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4632
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a task force (including members of the General Court) to identify and review state laws, regulations and administrative directives that prescribe requirements for school districts. Education.
Title
Establishing an educational mandate task force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4632 |
2017-09-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S1383 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S2000 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H226 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H306 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
S2081 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2191
H2041 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4632
H287 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4632
H4632 (Replaced by) 2018-06-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2000 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H226 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H306 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
S2081 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2191
H2041 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4632
H287 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4632
H4632 (Replaced by) 2018-06-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2875 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2875.pdf |