MA H2900 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5043
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to work from home tax incentives. Revenue.
Title
Relative to work from home incentives
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Frost [R] | Rep. Shawn Dooley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5043 |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/04/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2916 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H5043 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1908 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1925 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H5043 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1908 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1925 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2900 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2900.pdf |