MA H2923 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to erect a suitable marker, in memory of Carl E. Hosea, Jr., in Pope John Paul II Park in the Dorchester section of the city of Boston . Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Designating a certain area in the Dorchester section of the city of Boston in memory of Carl E. Hosea, Jr
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Hunt [D] | Sen. Linda Forry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2017-06-07 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-06-05 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2017-05-08 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-04-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H394 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H397 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1775 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H2141 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1686 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
H2908 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4579
H2142 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4579
H389 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H410 (Similar To) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
H3727 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2017
H1701 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1800 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3921 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4005
H3749 (Similar To) 2017-07-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2017
H4086 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H4927
H397 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1775 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H2141 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1686 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4683
H2908 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4579
H2142 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4579
H389 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H410 (Similar To) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
H3727 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2017
H1701 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1800 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3921 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4005
H3749 (Similar To) 2017-07-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2017
H4086 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H4927
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2923 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2923.pdf |