MA H4086 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4927
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-31 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H4927
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-31 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H4927
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to boards and commissions in the city of Boston. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to boards and commissions of the city of Boston
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H4927 |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H4927 |
2018-10-11 | House | Amendment adopted, see H4927 |
2018-10-11 | House | Bills in the Third Reading special report accepted |
2018-10-11 | House | Read third |
2018-01-29 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-01-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-01-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-01-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-12-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-12-21 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S1153 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H410 (Similar To) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
S1688 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3921 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4005
H394 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H397 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2540 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 175 of the Acts of 2018
H4927 (Replaced by) 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 373 of the Acts of 2018
H410 (Similar To) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
S1688 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3921 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4005
H394 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H397 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2540 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 175 of the Acts of 2018
H4927 (Replaced by) 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 373 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4086 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4086.pdf |