MA S2540 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 175 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 175 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to a certain parcel of conservation land in the city of Boston. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to a certain parcel of conservation land in the city of Boston
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-31 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 511 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 511 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #568 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 511 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #568 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 175 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-07-31 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2018-07-31 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #568 (Yeas 36 to Nays 0) |
2018-07-31 | House | Enacted - 151 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 511) |
2018-07-31 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-31 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-07-31 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-07-25 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-25 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-06-06 | House | House concurred |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H4561 (Similar To) 2018-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 170 of the Acts of 2018
S927 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S926 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1152 (Similar To) 2017-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2017
H1106 (Similar To) 2017-05-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2017
S1572 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H4627 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 176 of the Acts of 2018
H4769 (Similar To) 2018-07-25 - New draft substituted, see H4816
H4839 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 184 of the Acts of 2018
H4837 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 193 of the Acts of 2018
H4838 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - Enacted - 151 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 510)
H4923 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S927 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S926 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1152 (Similar To) 2017-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2017
H1106 (Similar To) 2017-05-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2017
S1572 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H4627 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 176 of the Acts of 2018
H4769 (Similar To) 2018-07-25 - New draft substituted, see H4816
H4839 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 184 of the Acts of 2018
H4837 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 193 of the Acts of 2018
H4838 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - Enacted - 151 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 510)
H4923 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken