MA H2942 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4317
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4317
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4317
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to update the bottle deposit system and lower the cost of recycling beverage containers in the Commonwealth. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
To update the bottle deposit system and lower the cost of recycling beverage containers in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-17 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4317 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-05-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday July 15, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-12-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H4317 (Replaced by) 2014-07-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2942 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2942.pdf |