MA H2945 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4727
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4727
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4727
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing a senior property tax deferral pilot program. Revenue.
Title
Establishing a senior property tax deferral pilot program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4727 |
2023-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1841 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2656
H3849 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4279
H4279 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4505 (Similar To) 2024-04-03 - Hearing scheduled for 04/10/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
H4727 (Replaced by) 2024-06-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3849 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4279
H4279 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4505 (Similar To) 2024-04-03 - Hearing scheduled for 04/10/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
H4727 (Replaced by) 2024-06-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2945 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2945.pdf |