MA H295 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to increasing the experience and background necessary to operate low pressure processed steam boilers. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Increasing the experience and background necessary to operate low pressure processed steam boilers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-03-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/18/2014 from 03:00 PM-03:30 PM in A-1 |
2014-01-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/28/2014 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H295 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H295.pdf |