MA H2957 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4396
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4396
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4396
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize coastal cities and towns to designate certain coastal areas as exclusion zones for wind turbine development. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
To restore local control in coastal communities of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4396 |
2013-12-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/03/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H4396 (Replaced by) 2014-08-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2957 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2957.pdf |