MA H2961 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to erect a marker on Route 3 designating Marshfield as the home of Senator Daniel Webster and Governor Edward Winslow. Transportation.
Title
Designating Marshfield the home of Senator Daniel Webster and Governor Edward Winslow
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-05-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-05-16 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-05-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-01-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/02/2016 from 12:15 PM-02:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H2103 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H332 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied S297
H2104 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Read second, amended and ordered to a third reading
H1223 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1084 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4208
H332 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied S297
H2104 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Read second, amended and ordered to a third reading
H1223 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1084 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4208
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2961 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2961.pdf |