MA H2987 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4396
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4396
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4396
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing energy relief funds to provide relief for detrimental health effects and property losses caused by wind energy generation. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relieving the adverse effects of wind energy
Sponsors
Rep. David Vieira [R] | Rep. Timothy Madden [D] | Rep. Brian Mannal [D] | Rep. William Pignatelli [D] |
Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Rep. Thomas Calter [D] | Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R] | Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4396 |
2013-12-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/03/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H4396 (Replaced by) 2014-08-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2987 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2987.pdf |