MA H3009 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4791
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize municipalities to use manufactured housing as affordable housing. Housing.
Title
Expanding the definition of affordable housing
Sponsors
Rep. Shawn Dooley [R] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] | Sen. Richard Ross [R] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-23 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4791 |
2017-12-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/19/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H3693 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4004
H703 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H652 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H2242 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H3015 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
S752 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
S2344 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Reprinted as amended, see S2373
H4791 (Replaced by) 2018-07-23 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H703 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H652 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H2242 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H3015 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
S752 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
S2344 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Reprinted as amended, see S2373
H4791 (Replaced by) 2018-07-23 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3009 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3009.pdf |