MA H303 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4042
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to an investigation by a special commission (including members of the General Court) for the distribution formula of the State Lottery. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Resolve for an investigation and study relative to the distribution formula of the State Lottery
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4042 |
2013-05-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4042 (Replaced by) 2014-06-16 - Reported, in part, by H3636
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H303 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H303.pdf |