MA H3033 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-05 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-05 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to increasing the fine for speeding in a “breakdown lane” where such travel is permitted. Transportation.
Title
Protecting motorists and emergency personnel
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-05 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2016-06-30 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-01-19 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-01-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-01-19 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-01-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-10-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2015 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H222 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H900 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1446 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1447 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1448 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H900 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1446 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1447 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1448 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3033 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3033.pdf |