MA H306 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5041
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the sale of dogs, cats and rabbits in pet shops. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to the sale of dogs and cats in the Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5041 |
2021-11-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/17/2021 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-05-27 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Environmental, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H5041 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H306 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H306.pdf |