MA H3085 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3938
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3938
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3938
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit the use of a mobile phone while operating a motor vehicle on any public way. Transportation.
Title
Relative to safe driving
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3938 |
2012-01-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/10/2012 from 10:00 AM-12:30 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3938 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3085 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14738&generalCourtId=1 |