MA H3088 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the purchase of tunnel safety insurance by the Executive Office of Transportation. Transportation.
Title
Concerning tunnel safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-12-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/02/2020 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H2394 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H901 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H903 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1115 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S637 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S597 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S623 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H2245 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H1006 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H3746 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S2295 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
H4210 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2019
S2416 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H901 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H903 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1115 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S637 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S597 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S623 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H2245 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H1006 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H3746 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S2295 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
H4210 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2019
S2416 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3088 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3088.pdf |