MA H3097 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to eliminating the procurement act exception for waste and recycling contracts. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Eliminating the procurement act exception for waste and recycling contracts
Sponsors
Rep. Tram Nguyen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3097 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3097.pdf |