MA H3111 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4546
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to expenditures for maintaining, repairing, improving and constructing municipal ways and bridges, and other eligible municipal projects. Transportation.
Title
Promoting equitable distribution of Chapter 90 funds
Sponsors
Rep. William Pignatelli [D] | Rep. John Barrett [D] | Sen. Adam Hinds [D] | Sen. Paul Mark [D] |
Rep. Natalie Blais [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4546 |
2019-11-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H2975 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
S2150 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
H4546 (Replaced by) 2020-03-09 - Reported, in part, by H3592
S2150 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
H4546 (Replaced by) 2020-03-09 - Reported, in part, by H3592
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3111 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3111.pdf |