MA H3133 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4616
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4616
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4616
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Crighton of Lynn, a petition of Brendan P. Crighton and others for the adoption of resolutions memorializing the Congress of the United States to reject the proposed Trans-Pacific Partnership free trade agreement. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Resolutions to urge the Congress of the United States to reject the proposed Trans-Pacific Partnership free trade agreement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4616 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, May 13, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-10-26 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/28/2015 from 01:30 PM-05:30 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2015-10-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/28/2015 from 01:30 PM-05:30 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H4616 (Replaced by) 2016-09-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H144 (Similar To) 2015-11-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2065
H2253 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2254 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H644 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Senate concurred
H2472 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H144 (Similar To) 2015-11-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2065
H2253 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2254 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H644 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Senate concurred
H2472 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3133 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3133.pdf |