MA H2254 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4367
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to directing the State Retirement Board to grant creditable service to Thomas Famulari. Public Service.
Title
Authorizing the State Retirement Board to grant creditable service to Thomas Famulari
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4367 |
2015-05-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/12/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4367 (Replaced by) 2016-06-09 - Reported, in part, by H4012
H144 (Similar To) 2015-11-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2065
H3133 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4616
H2253 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H644 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Senate concurred
H2472 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H144 (Similar To) 2015-11-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2065
H3133 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4616
H2253 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H644 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Senate concurred
H2472 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2254 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2254.pdf |