MA H3150 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to wages for certain human service providers. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to fair pay for comparable work
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-03-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-10-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/10/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-05-15 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1042 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1034 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
S1008 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2447
S994 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
S996 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
H1048 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H3771 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H3459 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H1034 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
S1008 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2447
S994 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
S996 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
H1048 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H3771 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H3459 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3150 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3150.pdf |