MA H3195 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4778
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to uniform natural gas leaks classification for gas companies and field safety in gas infrastructure. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
For field safety in gas infrastructure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4778 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday April 7, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S1918 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4778 (Replaced by) 2024-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4778 (Replaced by) 2024-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3195 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3195.pdf |