MA H3199 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase the annuities paid to certain disabled veterans and their families. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Increasing the annuity for gold star families
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] | Rep. Donald Wong [R] | Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] |
Sen. Ryan Fattman [R] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Rep. James Hawkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-08-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:30 PM in 428 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H2395 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2401 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H3042 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1261 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2641 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2401 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H3042 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1261 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2641 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3199 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3199.pdf |