MA H3138 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Registry of Motor Vehicles to issue service branch designations on license plates for disabled veterans. Transportation.
Title
Allowing a service branch designation on license plates for disabled veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2020-01-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
H359 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H3003 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
H4050 (Similar To) 2020-09-24 - Senate concurred
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H3137 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H3049 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2641 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H1087 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4810
H3147 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H359 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H3003 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
H4050 (Similar To) 2020-09-24 - Senate concurred
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H3137 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H3049 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2641 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H1087 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4810
H3147 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3138 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3138.pdf |