MA H1087 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4810
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4810
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4810
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to motor vehicle service contracts. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to motor vehicle service contracts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4810 |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-05-04 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 4, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-10-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H2668 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H33 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2486 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
H2771 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H1584 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2956 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3385 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3082 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3154 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2072 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2993 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2112 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3270 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1529 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3056 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3137 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4810 (Replaced by) 2020-06-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H33 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2486 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
H2771 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H1584 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2956 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3385 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3082 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3154 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2072 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2993 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2112 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3270 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1529 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3056 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3137 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4810 (Replaced by) 2020-06-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1087 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1087.pdf |