MA H3137 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Registry of Motor Vehicles to develop, design and implement a redesigned registration plate system for motor vehicles. Transportation.
Title
To enhance the license plate system of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee recommended ought NOT to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-01-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
H359 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H3003 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
H4050 (Similar To) 2020-09-24 - Senate concurred
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H3049 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H359 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H3003 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
H4050 (Similar To) 2020-09-24 - Senate concurred
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H3049 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3137 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3137.pdf |