MA H32 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4969
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4969
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4969
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
So much of the recommendations of the Department of the State Treasurer (House, No. 25) as relates to the operations of said department. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to Treasury operations
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4969 |
2021-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1364 (Similar To) 2021-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2021
S1355 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 336 of the Acts of 2022
H26 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4587
H27 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H3909 (Similar To) 2022-03-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2022
H3970 (Similar To) 2021-12-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 101 of the Acts of 2021
S2518 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 226 of the Acts of 2022
H31 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H33 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H41 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4694
S2031 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2828
S203 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H4969 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1355 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 336 of the Acts of 2022
H26 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4587
H27 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H3909 (Similar To) 2022-03-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2022
H3970 (Similar To) 2021-12-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 101 of the Acts of 2021
S2518 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 226 of the Acts of 2022
H31 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H33 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H41 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4694
S2031 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2828
S203 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H4969 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H32 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H32.pdf |