MA H3200 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - House concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - House concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to voluntary contribution check-off boxes on municipal tax bills for support of local veterans’ agents. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
In support of veterans and dependents through municipal tax bills
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Cusack [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-19 | House | House concurred |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Amendment (changing reporting date to Thursday December 31, 2020) adopted, pending concurrence |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday October 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-06-15 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday October 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-05 | House | House concurred |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-08-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:30 PM in 428 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H2395 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2398 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2401 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2541 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H3214 (Similar To) 2020-10-19 - House concurred
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H3215 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H3246 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2337 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2398 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2401 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2541 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H3214 (Similar To) 2020-10-19 - House concurred
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H3215 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H3246 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2337 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3200 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3200.pdf |