MA H3227 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5031
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5031
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5031
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to permit enhanced public access to deliberations of public bodies and to permit improved efficiency of public bodies. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To permit enhanced public access to deliberations of public bodies and to permit improved efficiency of public bodies
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-18 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H5031 |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday July 15, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-04-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2055 (Similar To) 2022-07-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5031
H1012 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H3201 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4969
H5031 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3224 (Similar To) 2022-07-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5031
H1012 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H3201 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4969
H5031 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3224 (Similar To) 2022-07-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5031
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3227 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3227.pdf |