MA H323 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4434
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4434
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4434
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the reporting of certain data to assist in judging the impact of economic development investments. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Relative to transparency of economic development spending
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4434 |
2013-05-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/11/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
H4434 (Replaced by) 2014-09-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H323 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H323.pdf |