MA H3237 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3166
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Accompanied H3166
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Accompanied H3166
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to equity of bidders for public agency contracts and subcontracts. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to equity in public workforce
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | House | Accompanied H3166 |
2021-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1909 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S760 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H3245 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4969
S2529 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S673 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S502 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2880
S1212 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2882
H3166 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S760 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H3245 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4969
S2529 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S673 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S502 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2880
S1212 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2882
H3166 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3237 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3237.pdf |