MA S760 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2917
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to reduce racial and ethnic health disparities through commercial rate equity for safety net hospitals. Health Care Financing.
Title
To reduce racial and ethnic health disparities through commercial rate equity for safety net hospitals
Sponsors
Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Sen. Barry Finegold [D] | Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D] | Rep. Patricia Duffy [D] |
Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D] | Sen. John Keenan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2917 |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-03-31 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-06-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/29/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H1299 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
H1314 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
S784 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S1543 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2763
H1224 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S848 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
S2917 (Replaced by) 2022-06-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1314 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
S784 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S1543 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2763
H1224 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S848 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
S2917 (Replaced by) 2022-06-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S760 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S760.pdf |