MA H332 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4588
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4588
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4588
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit certain supplemental fees levied against prospective tenants or current tenants. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to consumer rights of renters
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4588 |
2021-07-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H827 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S420 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
H4306 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
H4588 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S420 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
H4306 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
H4588 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H332 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H332.pdf |