MA H3332 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4009
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4009
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4009
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act providing for the preservation and improvement of land, parks, and clean energy in the Commonwealth
Title
Providing for the preservation and improvement of land, parks, and clean energy in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4009 |
2013-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/18/2013 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2013-07-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/31/2013 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4009 (Replaced by) 2014-06-02 - New draft substituted, see H4138
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3332 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3332.pdf |