MA H3333 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5081
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to workplace discrimination complaints. The Judiciary.
Title
Removing barriers to justice in the workplace
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5081 |
2019-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1756 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
H267 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2740 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2725
H3425 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1096 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S115 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S851 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3833 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H267 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2740 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2725
H3425 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1096 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S115 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S851 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3833 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3333 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3333.pdf |