MA H3334 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3736
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-13 - New draft substituted, see H3736
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-13 - New draft substituted, see H3736
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Encouraging the improvement, expansion and development of military installations in the Commonwealth
Title
Encouraging the improvement, expansion and development of military installations in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-13 | House | New draft substituted, see H3736 |
2013-11-13 | House | Amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2013-11-13 | House | Amendment (H3718) rejected |
2013-11-13 | House | Read second |
2013-11-04 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendments previously recommended pending |
2013-11-04 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendments previously recommended pending |
2013-11-04 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H3736 |
2013-10-21 | House | Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means with the amendment pending |
2013-10-21 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H3718 |
2013-08-23 | House | Hearing scheduled for 09/11/2013 from 12:30 PM-02:30 PM in A-1 |
2013-08-14 | House | Hearing scheduled for 09/11/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-07-03 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to committee on House Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
2013-06-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2013 from 02:00 PM-03:00 PM in 222 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H3736 (Replaced by) 2014-03-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3334 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3334.pdf |