MA H3736 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3334
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Encouraging the improvement, expansion and development of military installations in the Commonwealth
Title
Encouraging the improvement, expansion and development of military installations in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-14 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #272 [YEAS 35 - NAYS 2] |
2014-03-12 | House | Enacted 151 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 302) |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-03-10 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House further amendment |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-03-05 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment with a further amendment, see text of House document numbered 3930 |
2014-03-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed - see Roll Call #240 [Yeas 39 - Nays 0] |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Read third |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S1988 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Pending amendment, S1982 rejected |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Read second |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S1988 |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S1982 |
2013-11-18 | Senate | Hearing scheduled for 11/20/2013 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-11-14 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
2013-11-13 | House | Passed to be engrossed 150 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 253) |
2013-11-13 | House | Amendment adopted |
2013-11-13 | House | Read third |
2013-11-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-11-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-11-13 | House | Amendment adopted |
2013-11-13 | House | New draft of H3334 |
2013-11-04 | House | Pending new draft of H3334 |
2013-11-04 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H3334 (Replaces) 2013-11-13 - New draft substituted, see H3736
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3736 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3736.pdf |