MA H3336 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to energy facilities siting reform to address environmental justice, climate, and public health. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to energy facilities siting reform to address environmental justice, climate, and public health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-01-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2022 from 11:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S2135 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2198 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2198 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3336 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3336.pdf |