MA H3359 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4992
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H04992
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H04992
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to railroad crossings
Title
Railroad crossings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-19 | Accompanied a study order, see H04992 | |
2010-04-13 | Discharged from committee and recommitted to the Joint Committee on Transportation | |
2010-03-11 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2009-01-20 | Public Hearing date 9/22 at 11:00 AM in Hearing Room A2 | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4992 (Replaced by) 2010-08-19 - Discharged to the House Committee On Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/h03359.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/house/186/ht03/ht03359.htm |