MA H3364 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 302 of the Acts of 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 302 of the Acts of 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to air rights over the Massachusetts Turnpike
Title
Air rights over the Massachusetts Turnpike
Sponsors
Rep. Martha Walz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-11 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 302 of the Acts of 2010 | |
2010-08-02 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | |
2010-07-31 | Enacted | |
2010-07-31 | Emergency preamble adopted | |
2010-07-31 | Emergency preamble adopted | |
2010-07-31 | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-07-30 | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-07-30 | Rules suspended | |
2010-07-07 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2010-05-17 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading | |
2010-04-05 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2009-01-20 | Public Hearing date 9/15 at 11:00 AM in Hearing Room B1 | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/h03364.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/house/186/ht03/ht03364.htm |