MA H337 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-16 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the House Committee On Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-16 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the House Committee On Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
For legislation to establish the Massachusetts Opportunity Rebuilding and Expansion Infrastructure Program
Title
Establish the Massachusetts Opportunity Rebuilding and Expansion Infrastructure Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-16 | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the House Committee On Ways and Means | |
2010-05-27 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee On Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets | |
2010-04-01 | Senate concurred | |
2010-03-31 | Reporting date extended to Friday, May 21, 2010 | |
2009-01-20 | Public Hearing date 6/9 at 1:00 PM in Hearing Room 222 | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/h00337.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/house/186/ht00/ht00337.htm |