MA H3395 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1911
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-29 - Reported by H3644
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-29 - Reported by H3644
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the reorganization of the judicial system. Senate Ways and Means .
Title
Relative to the Reorganization of the Judicial System of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-29 | House | Reported by H3644 |
2011-05-31 | Senate | Committee of conference appointed (Creem-Joyce-Tarr), in concurrence |
2011-05-31 | Senate | Senate insisted on its amendments |
2011-05-26 | House | Committee of Conference appointed (O'Flaherty-Dempsey-Winslow) |
2011-05-26 | House | House NON-concurred in the Senate amendment |
2011-05-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed (see Roll Call #16 Yeas 39 - Nays 0) |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Reprinted as amended, see S1911 |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Bills in the Third Reading amendment adopted |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Ways and Means new text (S1907) adopted, as amended |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Read second |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S1907 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Read and referred to Senate Committee on Ways and Means |
2011-05-11 | House | Passed to be engrossed - 152 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 77) |
2011-05-11 | House | Amendment adopted |
2011-05-11 | House | 146 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 76) |
2011-05-11 | House | Read third |
2011-05-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-05-11 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-05-09 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2011-05-09 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-05-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2011-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/03/2011 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-04-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-04-25 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1911 (Replaces) 2011-05-24 - See, H3395
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3395 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=16003&generalCourtId=1 |