MA H3417 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for John Gustavis, an employee of the Hampshire County Sheriff's Department. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for John Gustavis, an employee of the Hampshire sheriff's office
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2013 | |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2013-05-02 | House | Enacted |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2013-05-01 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2013-04-24 | House | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2013-04-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2013-04-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-04-11 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on Public Service |
2013-04-08 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3417 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3417.pdf |