MA H3421 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4111
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require banks to include community reinvestment goals in annual reports to the Commissioner of the Division of Banks. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to community reinvestment goals for banks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4111 |
2015-10-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/27/2015 from 10:30 AM-02:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H4111 (Replaced by) 2016-04-04 - Reported, in part, by H948
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3421 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3421.pdf |