MA H3431 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-08 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-08 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to establishing a special commission (including members of the General Court) to study the preparedness of the Commonwealth for natural disasters. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Resolve providing for an investigation and study by a special commission relative to preparedness for natural disasters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-08 | House | Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2014-01-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/11/2014 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3431 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3431.pdf |