MA H3435 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4062
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4062
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4062
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Conroy of Wayland, a petition of Thomas P. Conroy, James Eldridge and Susan Fargo (by vote of the town) that the town of Sudbury be authorized to establish a senior citizen property tax exemption. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the Town of Sudbury to establish a means tested senior citizen property tax exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4062 |
2011-05-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/09/2011 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-05-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-05-05 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4062 (Replaced by) 2012-07-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 169 of the Acts of 2012
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3435 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14978&generalCourtId=1 |