MA H344 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-2)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-2)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Impose a penalty for the devocalization of dogs and cats
Title
Prohibiting devocalization of dogs and cats.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2010 | |
2010-04-13 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | |
2010-04-12 | Enacted | |
2010-04-08 | House concurred in the Senate amendment | |
2010-04-08 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-01 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-04-01 | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text contained in S2359 | |
2010-04-01 | Read second | |
2010-04-01 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-01 | Committee recommended ought to be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2359 | |
2010-03-04 | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Committee On Ethics and Rules | |
2010-03-03 | Motion to reconsider negatived | |
2010-03-03 | Passed to be engrossed 155 YEAS to 1 NAYS (See Yea and Nay in Supplement, | |
2010-03-03 | Amendment 3 rejected 48 YEAS to 110 NAYS (See Yea and Nay in Supplement | |
2010-03-03 | Further amendment adopted | |
2010-03-03 | Amendment 3 pending | |
2010-03-03 | Amendment 2 withdrawn | |
2010-03-03 | Amendment 2 pending | |
2010-03-03 | Read third | |
2009-11-04 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2009-10-26 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading | |
2009-10-22 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the committee on Joint Committee on the Judiciary |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/House/H344 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=927&generalCourtId=2 |